CPDatabase.com
Home
- People -
Samer Al Sadek
Samer Al Sadek
Work History and Education
GM
( 2001/03/01 - Present )
Al Sadek Industrial & Trading Company LLC
GM
( 2015/04/01 - Present )
The Agency - WA
Real Estate
Lead Adviser,
( 2012/09/01 - 2015/04/01 )
Tandy Corporation
Electrical/electronic Manufacturing
Sales Manager
( 1998/02/01 - 2000/02/01 )
You Might Be Interested With:
Sreeraj Nair
Financial Executive
at
Al Sadek Industrial & Trading Company LLC
Akhil Nair
Head Of HR & Operations
at
Al Sadek Industrial & Trading Company LLC
Rajendran Pillai
Supervisor
at
Al Sadek Industrial & Trading Company LLC
Allif Machado
Cascavel, Paraná, Brazil
Aprendiz Industrial
at
Mascarello Carrocerias e Ônibus
FreeLancer
Ibrahim Sadek
General Manager
at
Al Sadek Industrial & Trading Company LLC
Kashif Ullah
Plastic bag cutting operater
at
Al Sadek Industrial & Trading Company LLC
Copyright © 2023 - 2024
CPDatabase.com
|
About Us
|
Privacy Policy
|
Do Not Sell My Personal Info